Bailey v. City Of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Bailey
Defendant: Department of Buildings, City Of Chicago and Corporation Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv04168
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to reopen case #14 is denied. See 7/23/2020 order #13 .Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Bailey Civil Rights: Request to reopen case (rc, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to reopen case #12 is denied. See 7/17/2020 order #7 and 7/21/2020 order #11 . Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Bailey to reinstate case (tg, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/21/2020. The 7/17/2020 order and judgment #7 #8 dismissed this case. The Clerk is directed to refund to Plaintiff the filing fee 9 of $400.00, receipt number 4624243700 he paid.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT filed by Melvin Bailey. (gcy, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 7/17/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff commenced this suit without paying the $400.00 filing fee or applying for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Rather than resolve Plaintiff's fee status, the court dismissed this case without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff and Defendant are not diverse, and the complaint plainly shows that Plaintiff is alleging a violation of only state and local law. Plaintiff is free to re-file his suit in state court. Enter judgment order. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/2020. (lma, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Melvin Bailey. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Melvin Bailey. (Exhibits) Fee Due (nsf, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Buildings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?