Miles v. Radiological Society of North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauren Miles
Defendant: Radiological Society of North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04200
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Radiological Society of North America, Inc. by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Radiological Society of North America, Inc. by Craig R. Thorstenson (Thorstenson, Craig)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lauren Miles. Radiological Society of North America, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Martoccio, Gary)
July 16, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lauren Miles by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Lauren Miles; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17222535. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Martoccio, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Radiological Society of North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiological Society of North America, Inc.
Represented By: Becky Lynn Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Thorstenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Miles
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?