John Doe v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2020cv04217
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by John Doe Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Hierl, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (smm, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(smm, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff is given until August 3, 2020, to file a memorandum supporting joinder of defendants that engages in detail with the joinder framework set forth in the Court's June 22, 2020 order in Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A," 20-cv-845 at ECF No. 40. Plaintiff may alternatively file an amended complaint that is in compliance with that framework. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Struck Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Reiter Declaration, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication, MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for temporary restraining order (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for leave to file excess pages (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 1 (Hierl, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17225821.(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?