SMART Transportation Division v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-01, SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART-TD GCA GO-393 and SMART Transportation Division
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04220
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Donald J. Munro for presentment of motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/15/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Munro, Donald)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 56.1(a) Statement by BNSF Railway Company regarding motion to dismiss #17 (Munro, Donald)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss #17 by BNSF Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of A. Smith, #3 Exhibit 2 Decl. of A.Smith, #4 Declaration of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #5 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #6 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #7 Errata 3 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #8 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #9 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #10 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr., #11 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of Milton H. Siegele, Jr.)(Munro, Donald)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant BNSF Railway Company to dismiss Or In The Alternative For Summary Judgment (Munro, Donald)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiffs SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART Transportation Division, SMART-TD GCA GO-393, SMART-TD GCA GO-01 for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Affidavit Ferguson Declaration, #4 Affidavit Kime Declaration, #5 Affidavit LaPresta Declaration, #6 Affidavit Swiatek Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #10 Notice of Presentment, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by David Michael Pryor (Pryor, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Donald J. Munro (Munro, Donald)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS Report by SMART Transportation Division, SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART-TD GCA GO-01, SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (Mckinley, Shawn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #11 is granted. Based on the Court's review of the motion, the parties appear to have agreed on the filing of cross-motions on 9/4/2020, with responses due on 9/18/2020, and no replies. The Court adopts that schedule and on its own motion grants Plaintiffs an equal number of pages (22) for their initial brief in support of their cross-motion. Based on the forgoing, the Court will cancel the status hearing set for 9/3/2020 unless either party emails the Courtroom Deputy by 9/1/2020 requesting that the status hearing remain on the schedule. Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant BNSF Railway Company for leave to file Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Exceeding Page Limit (Unopposed) (Mohan, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs SMART Transportation Division, SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART-TD GCA GO-01, SMART-TD GCA GO-393 by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17311529. for Attorney David M. Pryor (Mohan, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Kerry Mohan as Local Counsel (Mohan, Kerry)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Sean M. Sullivan as Local Counsel (Sullivan, Sean)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BNSF Railway Company by Daniel J. Mohan as Local Counsel (Mohan, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 9/3/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the 9/3/2020 hearing is as follows: Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs SMART Transportation Division, SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART-TD GCA GO-01, SMART-TD GCA GO-393 by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs SMART Transportation Division, SMART-TD GCA GO-009, SMART-TD GCA GO-01, SMART-TD GCA GO-393 by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SMART Transportation Division; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17226597. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMART Transportation Division v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-01
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-009
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-393
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: David Michael Pryor
Represented By: Kerry Mohan
Represented By: Sean M. Sullivan
Represented By: Daniel J. Mohan
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?