Eternity Mart Inc v. Nature's Sources LLC
Plaintiff: Eternity Mart, Inc. doing business as Great Deals of Texas
Defendant: Nature's Sources, LLC
In Re: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv04221
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 02:431
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Nature's Sources, LLC to consolidate cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit transcript of 12-12-19, #2 Exhibit order if 7-1-20, #3 Exhibit order 7-17-20, #4 Exhibit order 7-27-20)(Zhao, Gary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to to counsel of record. (nsf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIVED from Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00218 (nsf,)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant's #4 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nature's Sources LLC, TO RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Compel (Zhao, Gary) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 12, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to objections filed in case number 2:20-mc-00002, and the Court's order to assign a new civil case number, the case has been randomly assigned to Judge Robert S Lasnik, case number 2:20-cv-00218. All future pleadings must now bear the newly assigned case number. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. This matter comes before the Court on a motion to compel third-party Amazon.com, Inc., to produce documents for use in a litigation currently pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Dkt. # 1. Amazon.com, Inc., has opposed the requested relief. In light of the contested nature of this proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign a civil action number. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Attorney James E Howard for Amazon.com Inc added; per #8 Response to Motion. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by In Re Amazon.com Inc, to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Howard, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jean Lan Lin filed by In Re Amazon.com Inc re #1 MOTION to Compel (Howard, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Deana D. Ahn filed by In Re Amazon.com Inc re #1 MOTION to Compel (Howard, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE, by In Re Amazon.com Inc, to #1 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howard, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1 MOTION to Compel, #4 MOTION to Transfer Case reset Noting Date to 2/14/2020 per #7 Motion to Amend (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #6 Notice of Motion Re-Noted, #5 Proposed Order (Unsigned), #1 MOTION to Compel,, filed by Defendant Nature's Sources LLC. Noting Date 2/14/2020, (Winnell, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #1 MOTION to Compel. Filed by Defendant Nature's Sources LLC. Noting Date 2/7/2020, (Zhao, Gary) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case (Winnell, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant Nature's Sources LLC. Noting Date 2/7/2020, (Winnell, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary Zhao for Defendant Nature's Sources LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary Zhao FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nature's Sources LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6077507 (Winnell, Jason) Note: Case No. on PHV should read 2:20-mc-00002. Updated 1/9/2020 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Amazon.com Inc to Produce Subpoenaed Documents, filed by Defendant Nature's Sources LLC. (FEE PAID #SEA099435) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Zhao in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 PROPOSED Order, #3 Email transmittal) Noting Date 1/24/2020 (set by clerk), (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eternity Mart Inc v. Nature's Sources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature's Sources, LLC
Represented By: Gary Zhao
Represented By: Jason Winnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eternity Mart, Inc. doing business as Great Deals of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: James E Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?