Vyalikova v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation, THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, The Boeing Company and Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04233
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash and the Hon. M. David Weisman as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Weisman shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/26/2020. (lma, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova. The Boeing Company waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather M. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova by John Vasilios Kalantzis (Kalantzis, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Short Form filed by Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17227641.(Clifford, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vyalikova v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadezhda Alekseevna Vyalikova
Represented By: John Vasilios Kalantzis
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?