Polyakov v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation, THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, The Boeing Company and Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04236
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing set for 9/17/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash and the Hon. M. David Weisman as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; thereforeIt is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Weisman shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/26/2020. (sxb, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 9/17/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/10/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov. The Boeing Company waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov by John Vasilios Kalantzis (Kalantzis, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Short Form filed by Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17228037.(Clifford, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polyakov v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergey Aleksandrovich Polyakov
Represented By: John Vasilios Kalantzis
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?