Ivanenko v. Plasmanet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Radifa Ivanenko
Defendant: Galaxy Group, LA, LLC, Plasmanet, Inc., Plasmanet, Inc. doing business as Freelotto and Galaxy Group, LA, LLC doing business as Lottogopher Holdings, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv04243
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radifa Ivanenko as to Plasmanet, Inc. on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Sdrenka, Eric)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radifa Ivanenko as to Galaxy Group, LA, LLC on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Sdrenka, Eric)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Radifa Ivanenko regarding Summons served on Galaxy Group LA on July 29, 2020 (Sdrenka, Eric)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Radifa Ivanenko on Defendant Plasmanet, Inc (Sdrenka, Eric)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 9/29/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Galaxy Group, LA, LLC, Plasmanet, Inc. (ecw, )
July 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Radifa Ivanenko by Eric Michael Sdrenka (Sdrenka, Eric)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sdrenka, Eric)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Radifa Ivanenko; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17229273. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sdrenka, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanenko v. Plasmanet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radifa Ivanenko
Represented By: Eric Michael Sdrenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxy Group, LA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plasmanet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plasmanet, Inc. doing business as Freelotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galaxy Group, LA, LLC doing business as Lottogopher Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?