Jackson v. The City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Dezra Jackson
Defendant: The City of Chicago, Elizabeth Medina, Hitesh Patel, Lynnette Vega, Matthew Jackson, Ysenia Gallegos and Chadi Abouassi
Case Number: 1:2020cv04245
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Jackson by James E. Thompson (Thompson, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Maxwell Evan Lisy (Lisy, Maxwell)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Cheryl Lynne Friedman (Friedman, Cheryl)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #16 is granted. The time for the City of Chicago and Defendants Abouassi, Vega, Gallegos, Medina, and Patel to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 9/28/20. The deadline of 9/30/20 for parties to file joint initial status report is re-set to 10/19/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Friedman, Cheryl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Cheryl Lynne Friedman (Friedman, Cheryl)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago by Iris Y. Chavira (Chavira, Iris)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 9/30/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to Lynnette Vega on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to Hitesh Patel on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to Elizabeth Medina on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to Matthew Jackson on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to The City of Chicago on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dezra Jackson as to Chadi Abouassi on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chadi Abouassi, Ysenia Gallegos, Matthew Jackson, Elizabeth Medina, Hitesh Patel, The City of Chicago, Lynnette Vega (cp, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dezra Jackson by Thomas Patrick Needham (Needham, Thomas)
July 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather M. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dezra Jackson by Kathleen Anne Hennessy (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hennessy, Kathleen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dezra Jackson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17229402.(Hennessy, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. The City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Represented By: Iris Y. Chavira
Represented By: Cheryl Lynne Friedman
Represented By: Maxwell Evan Lisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitesh Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnette Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jackson
Represented By: James E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ysenia Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadi Abouassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dezra Jackson
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Hennessy
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?