Sosa v. Onfido, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fredy Sosa
Defendant: Onfido, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04247
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Onfido, Inc. by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to withdraw as attorney #16 is granted. Attorney Kathleen A. Stetsko is terminated as counsel for defendant. Mailed notice (ags)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Kathleen Stetsko of Perkins Coie LLP to withdraw as attorney for Onfido, Inc.. No party information provided (Stetsko, Kathleen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion for extension of time to answer #14 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 10/12/2020. Status hearing set for 10/1/2020 is stricken and reset to 11/12/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Onfido, Inc. for extension of time to file answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (Unopposed) (Griswold, Joel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Onfido, Inc. by Joel Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/10/2020. Initial status hearing is set for 10/1/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fredy Sosa by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fredy Sosa by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fredy Sosa by Schuyler Ufkes (Ufkes, Schuyler)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Onfido, Inc. for extension of time to file answer AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service and Filing of Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Defendant's Removal to Federal Court by Kathleen A. Stetsko on behalf of All Defendants (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Onfido, Inc. (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Onfido, Inc. by Kathleen A. Stetsko (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (20CH04554) filed by Onfido, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17229595. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Stetsko, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa v. Onfido, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredy Sosa
Represented By: Schuyler Ufkes
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onfido, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?