Collier v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Katina Collier
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04298
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #8 is vacated as entered in error on the incorrect docket. Mailed notice(maf)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss 15 on or before 10/9/20. Defendant shall reply on or before 10/16/20. The Court will rule by mail. Status report deadline of 10/23/20 is vacated.Mailed notice(maf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Katina Collier. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Eshoo, Edward)
July 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (exr, )
July 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Christina M. Phillips (Phillips, Christina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katina Collier by Edward Eshoo, Jr (Eshoo, Edward)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eshoo, Edward)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Katina Collier; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17241378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eshoo, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina Collier
Represented By: Christina M. Phillips
Represented By: Edward Eshoo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?