Ruffin El v. Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana)
Plaintiff: Ruffin El
Defendant: Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana)
Case Number: 1:2020cv04309
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 CIVIL Cover Sheet Rule 64(a) of the Civil Procedure by Ruffin El (pj, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #17 is due by 9/9/2020; defendant's reply by 9/30/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Michael Ruffin Jr. (nsf, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Ruffin El for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 64 of Civil Procedure Secured by Treaty. (nsf, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana) in support of motion to dismiss #17 Lake County Board of Commissioners' (Indiana) Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eli, Lamis)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana) to dismiss Lake County Board of Commissioners' (Indiana) Opposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Eli, Lamis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUPERIOR right of possession by Ruffin El. (Exhibits) (ph, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMARY judgment in replevin with or without notice - US Supremacy Clause by Ruffin El. (Exhibits) (ph, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Ruffin El. (ec, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Ruffin El for summary judgment pursuant to rule 64 of civil procedure by treaty. (ec, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana) by Anne Louise Yonover (Yonover, Anne)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana) by Lamis Ghassan Eli (Eli, Lamis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 FORMAL DECREE - Summary Judgment for Replevin by Ruffin El (ec, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Lake County Board of Commissioners and Tippecanoe County Board of Commissioners. (ec, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope post marked 7/20/20)(nsf, ) Modified on 7/31/2020 (nsf, ).
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Ruffin El. (Envelope post marked 7/20/2020) (nsf, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMARY judgment in replevin by Ruffin El. (Exhibits, Envelope post marked 7/23/20) (nsf, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ruffin El for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ruffin El (bg, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Ruffin El (Exhibits) (bg, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin El v. Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Board Commissioners (Indiana)
Represented By: Anne Louise Yonover
Represented By: Lamis Ghassan Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruffin El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?