Popper v. Kaech
Plaintiff: Joshua Popper
Defendant: James Kaech, Sr and James A. Kaech, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04383
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing and notice of motion date of 9/14 are stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the briefing schedule proposed in the parties 9/8/2020 joint status report #11 : Plaintiff to file his response to the Motion to Dismiss by 9/18/2020; and Defendant to file his reply in further support of the Motion to Dismiss by 10/9/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS Report by James A. Kaech, Sr. (Schick, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas John Kupchinsky Schick for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schick, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant James A. Kaech, Sr. to dismiss (Schick, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant James A. Kaech, Sr. by Thomas John Kupchinsky Schick (Schick, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant James A. Kaech, Sr. by Marty Jay Schwartz (Schwartz, Marty)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Popper as to James A. Kaech, Sr. on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Wunder, Christopher)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the 9/14/2020 hearing is as follows: Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 27, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant James Kaech, Sr. (ng, )
July 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Popper by Christopher S. Wunder (Wunder, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wunder, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Popper; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17254611. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wunder, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popper v. Kaech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kaech, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Kaech, Sr.
Represented By: Thomas John Kupchinsky Schick
Represented By: Marty Jay Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Popper
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?