731 Pharmacy Corp. v. Surescripts, LLC
Plaintiff: 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy and 731 Pharmacy Corp. doing business as Ivan Pharmacy
Defendant: Surescripts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04391
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. by Karin E. Garvey (Garvey, Karin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. by Gregory Asciolla (Asciolla, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. by Jonathan Scott Crevier (Crevier, Jonathan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorneys Karin E. Garvey's, Gregory S. Asciolla's, and Jonathan S. Crevier's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 #10 #11 are granted. Counsel are directed to file their appearances on behalf of the plaintiff. Mailed notice (air, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17337783. (Crevier, Jonathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17337769. (Asciolla, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17337739. (Garvey, Karin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Related Case No. 19cv6627. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/13/20.(gcy, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED CIVIL Cover Sheet (Freed, Michael) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/28/2020 (jh, ).
July 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy by Brian M. Hogan (Hogan, Brian)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy by Robert J. Wozniak (Wozniak, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy by Michael Jerry Freed (Freed, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Freed, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17256322.(Freed, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 731 Pharmacy Corp. v. Surescripts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 731 Pharmacy Corp. d/b/a Ivan Pharmacy
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 731 Pharmacy Corp. doing business as Ivan Pharmacy
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Crevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surescripts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?