Hamideh v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Faten Ibrahim Hamideh
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa, Christopher A. Way, Chad F. Wolf and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv04393
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Thomas Cioppa, Christopher A. Way, Chad Wolf (Oswald, Craig)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Thomas Cioppa, Christopher A. Way, Chad Wolf (Treacy, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Christopher A. Way, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jn, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:A joint status report is to be filed by 10/5/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Faten Ibrahim Hamideh ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17256590. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Odeh, Reem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamideh v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Way
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faten Ibrahim Hamideh
Represented By: Reem H Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?