Gerber v. Eastern PPE Imports, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Robert Gerber and Robert Gerber
Defendant: Eastern PPE Imports, LLC and John Does, 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv04408
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Gerber as to Eastern PPE Imports, LLC on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Clark, Dulijaza)
July 31, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Eastern PPE Imports, LLC (sxh, )
July 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Gerber by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Gerber by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Gerber by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Gerber; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17258790. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerber v. Eastern PPE Imports, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern PPE Imports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Robert Gerber
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gerber
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?