Ajir AI LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: AJIRA AI LLC
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04428
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Referring Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting joint request for entry of order setting briefing schedule. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/18/2020.Mailed notice(mjc, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter order adopting the parties' agreed #9 briefing schedule. In accordance with the order, Chase's anticipated motion to compel arbitration is briefed as follows: motion due: 10/5/2020; response due: 11/2/2020; reply due: 11/23/2020. Chase's motion to compel arbitration shall be decided before any further response to the complaint, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or otherwise, is due. If the court denies Chase's motion to compel arbitration, Chase's response to the complaint shall be due on or before thirty (30) days after the court issues its ruling on the motion to compel arbitration. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report - Joint Status Report and Request for Entry of an Order Setting Briefing Schedule by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Claydon, Jonathan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: This case has been reassigned to Judge Gottschall's calendar as related to Sha-Poppin Gourmet Popcorn, LLC v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al. ("Sha-Poppin"), No. 20-CV-2523. All settings are stricken. On or before 9/17/2020, the parties are directed to file a short status report giving their views on modifying the schedule for responding to the complaint in this case to align with the schedule established in Sha-Poppin (see ECF No. 45). Counsel in all three related actions are encouraged to confer and agree on a single schedule for all three cases. Mailed notice (mjc, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles P. Kocoras no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/4/2020. (bg, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion to extend JPMorgan Chase Bank, N/A.'s deadline to respond to complaint on or before 9/25/2020 #4 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 9:50 AM. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 - Agreed (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Jonathan Hale Claydon (Claydon, Jonathan)
July 29, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., (dxb, )
July 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by AJIRA AI LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17261352. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khowaja, Kasif)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajir AI LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJIRA AI LLC
Represented By: Kasif Khowaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?