Copeland v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: William Copeland
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Soo Line RR Co, The, Canadian Pacific Railway, SMART-TD/UTU Local 1433 and Soo Line Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04451
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Deadline for the parties to file a proposed discovery plan is extended to 10/28/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED complaint by William Copeland against International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, SMART-TD/UTU Local 1433, Soo Line Railroad Company and terminating Canadian Pacific Railway (O'Connor, Kevin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Copeland by Heewon O'Connor (O'Connor, Heewon)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan by September 28, 2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Copeland by Kevin Francis O'Connor (O'Connor, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Connor, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Copeland; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17263739.(O'Connor, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line RR Co, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian Pacific Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART-TD/UTU Local 1433
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Copeland
Represented By: Kevin Francis O'Connor
Represented By: Heewon O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?