Brooks et al v. Commonwealth Edison Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven Brooks, David A Chavez, David Chavez and 1540 N. Milwaukee LLC doing business as DSTRKT Bar & Grill
Defendant: Exelon Corporation, Commonwealth Edison and Commonwealth Edison Company doing business as ComEd
Case Number: 1:2020cv04555
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation's agreed motion for extension of time to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to amended complaint #23 is granted. Responsvie pleading to be filed by 11/2/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Amended Complaint (Agreed) (Truax, Terrence)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #21 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 10/1/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Amended Complaint (Agreed) (Truax, Terrence)
September 2, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by E. Glenn Rippie (Rippie, E.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by Gayle Littleton (Littleton, Gayle)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by Terrence Joseph Truax (Truax, Terrence)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Steven Brooks, David Chavez, 1540 N. Milwaukee LLC d/b/a DSTRKT Bar & Grill against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L.R. 3.2 Notification)(Selbin, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez regarding Summons In a Civil Case; Class Action Complaint, Jury Trial Demanded served on Commonwealth Edison Company on 08/13/2020 (Kaufman, Andrew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez regarding Summons In a Civil Case; Class Action Complaint, Jury Trial Demanded served on Exelon Corporation on 08/13/2020 (Kaufman, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Kevin R. Budner's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 5, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation (cp, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17283473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Attachment - KRB Court Admissions)(Budner, Kevin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Gary Michael Klinger (Klinger, Gary)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Rachel Geman's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17280951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions)(Geman, Rachel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Laurel G. Bellows Corrected Appearance for Laurel G. Bellows (Bellows, Laurel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 (Incorrect pdf linked) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by Laurel G. Bellows (Bellows, Laurel) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bg, ).
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Jason Louis Lichtman (Lichtman, Jason)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Andrew Richard Kaufman (Kaufman, Andrew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Brooks, David Chavez by Jonathan D. Selbin (Selbin, Jonathan)
August 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Selbin, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Brooks, David A Chavez; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17279226.(Selbin, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Commonwealth Edison Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Brooks
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: Kevin R Budner
Represented By: Andrew Richard Kaufman
Represented By: Gary Michael Klinger
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Laurel G. Bellows
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Chavez
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chavez
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: Kevin R Budner
Represented By: Andrew Richard Kaufman
Represented By: Gary Michael Klinger
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Laurel G. Bellows
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1540 N. Milwaukee LLC doing business as DSTRKT Bar & Grill
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gayle Littleton
Represented By: E. Glenn Rippie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company doing business as ComEd
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gayle Littleton
Represented By: E. Glenn Rippie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?