Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. v. AB Specialty Silicones, LLC
Petitioner: Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd.
Respondent: AB Specialty Silicones, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04592
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AB Specialty Silicones, LLC(Wayne, David)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion for default #8 is denied. Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #12 is granted. Responsive pleading due on 10/1/20. No appearance necessary on 9/24/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. in Opposition to MOTION by Respondent AB Specialty Silicones, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding motion for entry of default #8 #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Woo, Felix)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. in Opposition to motion for extension of time to file answer #12 (Woo, Felix)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by David Seth Wayne for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/24/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Wayne, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Respondent AB Specialty Silicones, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding motion for entry of default #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Wayne, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent AB Specialty Silicones, LLC by Hal R. Morris (Morris, Hal)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Response to motion for entry of default due by 9/11/20. If no response filed, the court will grant Plaintiff's motion. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent AB Specialty Silicones, LLC by David Seth Wayne (Wayne, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Petitioner Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Markoff)(Markoff, Paul)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 10/19/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. as to AB Specialty Silicones, LLC on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Markoff, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Motion to appear pro hac vice by Felix T. Woo #3 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17290349. (Woo, Felix)
August 5, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Respondent AB Specialty Silicones, LLC (jn, )
August 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. re complaint, #1 (Markoff, Paul)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award) filed by Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17285628. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sales Contracts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitral Award (Chinese), #3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitral Award (English Translaction), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Markoff, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd. v. AB Specialty Silicones, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AB Specialty Silicones, LLC
Represented By: Hal R. Morris
Represented By: David Seth Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hoshine Silicon Industry Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Paul F. Markoff
Represented By: Felix Thomas Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?