Souvannasot v. Hochschild
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Defendant: Roger C. Hochschild
Case Number: 1:2020cv04614
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00716 (bg)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Plaintiff alleges that Discover Card erroneously claims that he owes $1,954.55. He further alleges that Discover Card hired three different lawyers, who forced him to pay the erroneous balance in full. The complaint indicates that Plaintiff is suing the President of Discover Card for violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practice Act. To the extent that a viable and timely claim exists, Plaintiff does not demonstrate that the Southern District of Illinois is the proper forum for its resolution. This case has no apparent connection to this judicial district. Plaintiff lives in Joliet, Illinois and his claim is presumably based on events that occurred there. Consequently, this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Resolution of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 8) and his motion for counsel (Doc. 4) are left for the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/5/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Additional EXHIBITS by Niyom Souvannasot to #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 More Additional Exhibits)(kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Pro se Plaintiff (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff. (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Action due by 8/21/2020, per Doc. 5. (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Plaintiff re filing fee (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Niyom Souvannasot. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Exhibit) (kls3). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Sealed EXHIBITS re #2 Complaint filed by Niyom Souvannasot (kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Roger C. Hochschild, filed by Niyom Souvannasot.(kls3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kls3). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Niyom Souvannasot. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-716-MAB. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kls3) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 8/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souvannasot v. Hochschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger C. Hochschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?