International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04644
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 10/13/2020, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 (a "status hearing," in local parlance) on 10/19/2020 at 8:35 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Mckinley, Shawn)
August 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (jn, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
August 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17292851. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?