Gepner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: David Gepner
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04667
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Pursuant to the parties' notice of settlement #18 , this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(a). Absent reinstatement by 11/23/20, this dismissal shall convert to a dismissal with prejudice without further order. All set dates and deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Settlement by David Gepner (Goodwin, Tara)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time #16 is granted and any answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 10/2/2020. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer (Pyrdek, Brett)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Pyrdek, Brett)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Brett H. Pyrdek (Pyrdek, Brett)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 9/17/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Gepner as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Goodwin, Tara)
August 12, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (mp, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction (rc, )
August 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (gw, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Kasun Wijegunawardana (Corrected) (Wijegunawardana, Kasun)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Kasun Wijegunawardana (Amended) (Wijegunawardana, Kasun)
August 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Kasun Wijegunawardana (Wijegunawardana, Kasun)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Gepner by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Gepner; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17295503. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gepner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brett H. Pyrdek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gepner
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Kasun Wijegunawardana
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?