Circle 8 Logistics, LLC v. Your Carrier USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Circle 8 Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Your Carrier USA, Inc. and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Beazley Marine Syndicates 2623/623
Case Number: 1:2020cv04677
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Circle 8 Logistics, LLC as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Beazley Marine Syndicates 2623/623 on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Gajewski, Paul)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Circle 8 Logistics, LLC as to Your Carrier USA, Inc. on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Gajewski, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is to be filed by 10/19/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Beazley Marine Syndicates 2623/623, Your Carrier USA, Inc. (gw, )
August 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Circle 8 Logistics, LLC by Joel H. Steiner (Steiner, Joel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Circle 8 Logistics, LLC by Paul Anthony Gajewski (Gajewski, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gajewski, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Circle 8 Logistics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17297428. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Bill of Lading, #2 Appendix B - Broker-Carrier Contract, #3 Appendix C - C8 Carrier Load Confirmation, #4 Appendix D - C8 Insurance Policy)(Gajewski, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Circle 8 Logistics, LLC v. Your Carrier USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Circle 8 Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Gajewski
Represented By: Joel H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Your Carrier USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Beazley Marine Syndicates 2623/623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?