Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. v. Yeshwant et al
Plaintiff: Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc.
Defendant: Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant and B Windsor LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04688
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic motion hearing held on 9/1/2020. The Court is persuaded that no forum or Judge shopping took place and therefore reaffirms the termination of the present case. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY by Defendants Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant to set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #9 , response in opposition to motion, #7 , other, #10 , order on motion to dismiss, terminated case #8 , Response #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's 8/11/2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit Defendant's 8/12/2020 letter to FINRA, #3 Exhibit FINRA's 8/12/2020 letter to the parties, #4 Exhibit M. Fitapelli's 8/26/20 email to Plaintiff's counsel, #5 Exhibit Court's 8/27/2020 ECF notification, #6 Exhibit D. Hetzel's 8/27/2020 letter to the court)(Fitapelli, Marc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hetzel, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Copy of Letter to Justice Kocoras by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Justice Kocoras)(Fitapelli, Marc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court was unaware of Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to close case when it entered an order on the motion. The Court takes the opposition as a motion to reconsider the closing of the case, and as amounting to an accusation of forum-shopping. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a response to the motion by 8/28/2020 and directs Defendant to file a reply to the response by 8/31/2020. Ruling is set for 9/1/2020 at 9:40 AM, by telephone using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to close case #5 is granted. The motion to stay arbitration is withdrawn. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, B Windsor LLC, Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992, Akhileswari Yeshwant, Chilakamarri Yeshwantin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Close Case #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. August 11, 2020 letter to FINRA, #2 Exhibit B. August 21, 2020 order from FINRA)(Fitapelli, Marc)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17363304. (Fitapelli, Marc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. to dismiss Motion to Close Case (Baugh, David)
August 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. by Daniel Hetzel (Hetzel, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. by David A. Baugh (Baugh, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baugh, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. Plaintiff Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Arbitration Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-17299056. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baugh, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc. v. Yeshwant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akhileswari C. Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilakamarri Yeshwant Trust Dated April 24, 1992
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akhileswari Yeshwant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilakamarri Yeshwant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Windsor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ausdal Financial Partners, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Baugh
Represented By: Daniel Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?