Crestbrook Insurance Company et al v. Grepow, Inc.
Plaintiff: Crestbrook Insurance Company, Christine Ramsey and Matt Ramsey
Defendant: Grepow, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04759
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Referring Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman for the purposes of discovery supervision and to conduct a settlement conference. Initial status hearing scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the Court specifically requests that counsel consult the Court's standing order. If the parties believe the case is ready for a settlement conference, counsel should have available dates for a settlement conference for all necessary parties in advance of the status hearing, and to the extent possible, consult with opposing counsel in an attempt to identify mutually convenient and feasible dates for the settlement conference. Judge Weisman generally conducts settlement conferences Tuesdays, Wednesdays, Thursdays, and Fridays at either 10:30 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. or 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. If the parties do not wish to set a settlement conference at this time, the parties should be prepared to discuss discovery scheduling and related issues. Parties shall dial in using the Court's conference call-in number. The conference call-in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. Please note that the Court's conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the Court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called by the Court. Once the Court has heard your case you shall disconnect from the conference line. Mailed notice (ao,)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable M. David Weisman for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement. (cn) Mailed notice.
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grepow, Inc.(Snider, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: In light of the parties' status report #8 discovery ordered closed on 6/2/2021. End of discovery telephonic status hearing set for 6/2/2021 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1503395. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (cn).
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS Report Joint by Crestbrook Insurance Company (Burkhardt, Kyle)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form on or before 9/3/2020. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Form) (cn).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grepow, Inc.(Laflamme, Eugene)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burkhardt, Kyle)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(ec, )
August 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, State of Illinois, County Department, Law Division, case number (2020L007900) filed by Grepow, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17312647. (Laflamme, Eugene)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet by Grepow, Inc. (Laflamme, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crestbrook Insurance Company et al v. Grepow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grepow, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Mathieu Laflamme
Represented By: Michael A. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestbrook Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle R. Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ramsey
Represented By: Kyle R. Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Ramsey
Represented By: Kyle R. Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?