Felix v. Roosevelt University
Plaintiff: Oscar Felix
Defendant: Roosevelt University
Case Number: 1:2020cv04793
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER :Upon review of the joint status report #12 filed on 10/2/2020, the motion for extension of time to file status report #11 is stricken as moot and the motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is entered and continued. The anticipated motion to consolidate is due no later than 10/20/2020; if it is opposed, the parties should email the Courtroom Deputy with an agreed briefing schedule in lieu of filing a notice of motion for presentment. The initial status hearing set for 10/6/2020 is stricken and will be reset after the ruling on the motion to consolidate. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/5/2020. Mailed notice (mc, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Roosevelt University (Khetarpal, Monica)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Roosevelt University for extension of time Agreed Motion to File Joint Status Report (Simpson, Nicholas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oscar Felix by Edward W Ciolko (Ciolko, Edward)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Roosevelt University for extension of time (Khetarpal, Monica)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Roosevelt University by Nicholas A Simpson (Simpson, Nicholas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Roosevelt University by Kirsten Ann Milton (Milton, Kirsten)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Roosevelt University by Monica Hersh Khetarpal (Khetarpal, Monica)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Felix as to Roosevelt University on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Carroll, Katrina)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 10/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the hearing is as follows: Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 17, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Roosevelt University (jn, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carroll, Katrina)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Correct document for Dkt. entry no. 1 - attached incorrect document by Oscar Felix (Carroll, Katrina)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Oscar Felix; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17317693.(Carroll, Katrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Roosevelt University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt University
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Nicholas A Simpson
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Felix
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Edward W Ciolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?