Kunin v. Lang Law, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Yelena Kunin
Defendant: Lang Law, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04829
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court sets the following briefing schedule on defendant Lang Law, Ltd.'s Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss #14 : plaintiff's response due by 11/10/2020; defendant's reply due by 11/24/2020. Telephonic status hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1503395. Mailed notice (cn).
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order for Replevin in Underlying Case)(Marconi, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. motion to withdraw and substitute counsel #10 and unopposed motion for extension of time #12 are granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 10/12/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. for extension of time to file answer (Langs, Brian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. by Brian C. Langs (Langs, Brian)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. to substitute attorney (J&B for Bellas & Wachowski) (Marconi, Joseph)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. by Joseph R. Marconi (Marconi, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 10/2/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. for extension of time (Cygan, Misty)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. by Misty J. Cygan (Cygan, Misty)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. by George S. Bellas (Bellas, George)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yelena Kunin as to Lang Law, Ltd. on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Payton, Rusty)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lang Law, Ltd. (jn, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yelena Kunin by Rusty A. Payton (Payton, Rusty)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Yelena Kunin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17336923. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Retail Installment Contract & Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Lawsuit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, Rusty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kunin v. Lang Law, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelena Kunin
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lang Law, Ltd.
Represented By: George S. Bellas
Represented By: Brian C. Langs
Represented By: Misty J. Cygan
Represented By: Joseph R. Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?