Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. v. Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods and Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. doing business as Midwest Foods, an Indiana corporation
Defendant: Mary Shehan, Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC d/b/a Louis A. Weiss Memorial Hospital and Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC doing business as Louis A. Weiss Memorial Hospital, a Delaware limited liability company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04832
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to file an updated status report by 11/6/2020 unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date. (rao, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. (Khuans, Nicollette)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report for the case going forward on or before 9/28/2020. (rao, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 8/24/2020:(rao, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephonic motion hearing held on 8/24/2020. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #5 is granted. (rao, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone Conference regarding Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #5 is set for 8/24/2020 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to dial toll-free call-in number (888) 684-8852; followed by the conference access code 9482028. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendants. (rao, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS Report by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. (Serritella, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 8/20/2020 addressing (1) the status of service and (2) any request for a telephonic hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order #5 . (rao, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC d/b/a Louis A. Weiss Memorial Hospital, Mary Shehan (exr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by Nicollette Liv Khuans (Khuans, Nicollette)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by William J. Serritella, Jr (Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17337624. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Serritella, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. v. Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Shehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC d/b/a Louis A. Weiss Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline-Weiss Memorial Hospital, LLC doing business as Louis A. Weiss Memorial Hospital, a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. doing business as Midwest Foods, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?