Harris v. Saul
Plaintiff: Emma Harris
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv04833
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: In the event the Commissioner might be contemplating a second 60-day extension of time to file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record, the grant of such a motion should not be presumed, and counsel for the Commissioner is requested to begin appropriate client communications now to ensure that a mechanism is in place to minimize delays in the transmittal of the record. Mailed notice. (jj, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Defendant's unopposed motion for first extension of time to file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (doc. #16 ) is granted; no appearance on the motion is required. Defendant is further given leave to file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record by no later than 5:00 p.m. on 12/18/20. Mailed notice. (jj, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hancock, Virginia)
September 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Justin Roger Poh of Change of Address (Poh, Justin)
September 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Joseph Stephen Sellers of Change of Address (Sellers, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Deborah Susan Spector of Change of Address (Spector, Deborah)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER :The case has been reassigned to this Court on consent (doc. #11 ). Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. #3 ) is granted. In accordance with Local Rule 16.4, after the filing of the Administrative Record, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Fuentes' standing orders for filing motions and/or proposed orders, which are available on Judge Fuentes' webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Signed by the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes on 9/9/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for all further proceedings. Parties consented to the reassignment. Signed by Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 20-4833.(mc, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Based upon the filing of the joint consent (Dckt. No. #9 ), this case will be sent to the Executive Committee for reassignment to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Hancock, Virginia)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Hancock, Virginia)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court directs the parties to consider whether they would like to consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. A PDF version of the Magistrate Judge Consent Form is available on the Court's website. Counsel shall confer in good faith and shall file a joint statement by September 8, 2020 indicating if they will consent to proceed to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emma Harris by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emma Harris by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emma Harris by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Emma Harris for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Emma Harris; (Spector, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Harris
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?