Family Smiles LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation, Family Dental of Virginia LLC, Family Smiles LLC and Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04838
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Family Dental of Virginia LLC, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation (Goodman, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearances will be required). Joint Rule 26 planning report due 11/24/2020. The court will enter an schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Family Dental of Virginia LLC. Sentinel Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Goodman, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Sentinel Insurance Company on 8/18/2020 by Plaintiffs Family Dental of Virginia LLC, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation. Waiver of service due by 9/17/2021. (Goodman, David)
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nies, Kalli)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Family Dental of Virginia LLC, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation by Kalli Kling Nies (Nies, Kalli)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Family Dental of Virginia LLC, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation by David Benjamin Goodman (Goodman, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation, Family Smiles LLC, Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles, Family Dental of Virginia LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17338640. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goodman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Smiles LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Von Westernhagen Dental Corporation
Represented By: Kalli Kling Nies
Represented By: David Benjamin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Dental of Virginia LLC
Represented By: Kalli Kling Nies
Represented By: David Benjamin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Smiles LLC
Represented By: Kalli Kling Nies
Represented By: David Benjamin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Von Westernhagen, LLC d/b/a Healthy Smiles
Represented By: Kalli Kling Nies
Represented By: David Benjamin Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?