Melcorp, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Melcorp, Inc.
Defendant: West American Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04839
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #13 and #14 are granted. By agreement #15 , Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 10/30/2020. Defendant shall file an early dispositive motion by 11/13/2020. Discovery is stayed pending the court's review of the forthcoming dispositive motion. The status hearing set for 10/15/2020 #7 is stricken and re-set for 11/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS Report by Melcorp, Inc. (Duncan, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17521750. (Kennedy, Kara)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17516346. (Powers, Tiffany)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Defendants Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company(Schirle, Kenneth)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melcorp, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Podolny, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company by Jonathan Kevin Barger (Barger, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company by Kenneth Clark Schirle (Schirle, Kenneth)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melcorp, Inc. as to West American Insurance Company on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Podolny, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 10/8/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melcorp, Inc. by Christopher J. Esbrook (Esbrook, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melcorp, Inc. by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr (Kozlowski, Michael)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company (jn, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Melcorp, Inc. (Podolny, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melcorp, Inc. by James Henry Podolny (Podolny, James)
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melcorp, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17338741. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melcorp, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L Powers
Represented By: Kara F. Kennedy
Represented By: Jonathan Kevin Barger
Represented By: Kenneth Clark Schirle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany L Powers
Represented By: Jonathan Kevin Barger
Represented By: Kenneth Clark Schirle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melcorp, Inc.
Represented By: James Henry Podolny
Represented By: Robert R Duncan
Represented By: Christopher J. Esbrook
Represented By: Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?