Storme v. The Taverna Collection, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Storme
Defendant: The Taverna Collection, Inc. and Reny Dubon
Case Number: 1:2020cv04841
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed on 9/18/2020 #6 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vincent Storme (Lubin, Peter)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 10/22/2020 at 9:50 AM. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Reny Dubon, The Taverna Collection, Inc. (jn, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vincent Storme by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vincent Storme by Peter Scott Lubin (Lubin, Peter)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lubin, Peter)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vincent Storme; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17338866. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Lubin, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storme v. The Taverna Collection, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Taverna Collection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reny Dubon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Storme
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: Peter Scott Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?