Hodges v. United States Bankruptcy Court for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division
Plaintiff: Telicia Hodges
Defendant: United States Bankruptcy Court for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division
Case Number: 1:2020cv04852
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff seeks to proceed in forma pauperis #8 . The court reviews Plaintiff's complaint #6 at 24, and determines that it fails to state a claim. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The complaint appears to raise procedural issues with Plaintiff's federal bankruptcy proceedings and states: "I need knowledge and facts of this case." #6 at 3. Plaintiff has also separately filed this complaint as an "emergency motion for request of knowledge and facts." #1 , #11 . Plaintiff's civil cover sheet again requests "knowledge and facts" when asked to describe the cause of action. #3 at 1. Construing the complaint liberally, Plaintiff does not state a claim for relief. The United States Bankruptcy Court for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division is not a suable entity. To the extent Plaintiff wishes to raise issues regarding her bankruptcy case, she must do so in the bankruptcy court. If Plaintiff seeks review of a judgment from the bankruptcy court, she must appeal or seek review of that judgment in the proper court. Plaintiff's complaint #6 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #8 and "emergency" motions #1 , #11 are denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this case in federal court, she must submit an amended complaint by October 1, 2020, identifying the basis for jurisdiction. Failure to submit an amended complaint by October 1, 2020 will lead to dismissal of this case with prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/3/2020. Mailed notice (jh, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges (sxb, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges (sxb, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Telicia Hodges. (aee, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges. (td, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges. (td, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges. (td, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges. (td, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Telicia Hodges. (aee, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of hearing by Telicia Hodges. (aee, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION to request knowledge and facts by Telicia Hodges. (aee, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. United States Bankruptcy Court for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telicia Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bankruptcy Court for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?