Reid v. Saul
Plaintiff: Keith A. Reid
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv04853
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez:Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record #16 is granted. The time for filing the administrative record is extended to 12/18/20.Mailed notice (lp, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Souza, Abraham)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez for ruling on final disposition of this case. The Parties are directed to review the LR 16.4 Scheduling in Social Security Cases available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and this Court's Standing Order in Social Security Cases. No further order will be entered regarding setting dates for a briefing schedule. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiff has filed an Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and #3 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1915, Plaintiff may proceed without prepaying if he cannot pay the required court fees and costs. See 28 U.S.C. section 1915(a)(1). "Although he must show that he cannot simultaneously pay court costs and provide for life's necessities, he 'need not be absolutely destitute in order to enjoy the benefit of [section] 1915.'" Garth-Richardson v. Univ. of Ill. at Chi., No. 03 C 5406, 2004 WL 726135, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 1, 2004) (quoting Zaun v. Dobbin, 628 F.2d 990, 992 (7th Cir. 1980)). According to the affidavit, neither Plaintiff nor his wife have any income, and they receive only a small amount of food assistance, and financial assistance from family, thus satisfying the showing of indigency. Additionally, an initial review of the complaint does not reveal that it "(i) is frivolous or malicious; (ii) fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; or (iii) seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief." See 28 U.S.C. section 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and #3 is therefore granted. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/21/2020. (sxb, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. This case will be sent to the executive committee for reassignment. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Justin Roger Poh of Change of Address (Poh, Justin)
September 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Joseph Stephen Sellers of Change of Address (Sellers, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Deborah Susan Spector of Change of Address (Spector, Deborah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Abraham Judson Souza as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Souza, Abraham)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith A. Reid by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith A. Reid by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith A. Reid by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Keith A. Reid for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Keith A. Reid; (Spector, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Abraham Judson Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Reid
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?