Hunter Technology Corporation v. Omega Global Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hunter Technology Corporation d/b/a Sparton Milpitas and Hunter Technology Corporation doing business as Sparton Milpitas
Defendant: Omega Global Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04858
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Hunter Technology Corporation to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grill, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omega Global Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Tank, Jordan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The response to the motion to dismiss #16 is due by 10/16/2020; reply by 10/30/2020. Status hearing set for 10/22/2020 is stricken and reset to 12/17/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Omega Global Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - J. Ochoa Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - 6-28-18 Emails, #4 Exhibit D - Sparton PO, #5 Exhibit E - Sparton General Provisions, #6 Exhibit F - 10-23-18 Invoice, #7 Exhibit G - Previous Invoices, #8 Exhibit H - Wire Confirmation, #9 Exhibit I - Z. Ochoa Affidavit, #10 Notice of Filing)(Tank, Jordan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Attorney Marc van Niekerk is added as counsel for defendant. Motion for extension of time #14 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/16/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Omega Global Technologies, Inc. for extension of time (Eckert, Ryan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17355650. (van Niekerk, Marc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Technology Corporation by Patrick R Moran (Moran, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Technology Corporation by Andrew Joseph Grill (Grill, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Attorney Michael W Stebbins is added as counsel for Omega Global Technologies, Inc. Mailed notice (ags)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17349640. (Stebbins, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Omega Global Technologies, Inc. by Ryan P Eckert (Eckert, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Omega Global Technologies, Inc. by Thomas John Pontikis (Pontikis, Thomas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 10/22/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 JURY Demand (Tank, Jordan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Omega Global Technologies, Inc. by Jordan Matthew Tank (Tank, Jordan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 006238) filed by Omega Global Technologies, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17341716. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tank, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Technology Corporation v. Omega Global Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Global Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Tank
Represented By: Thomas John Pontikis
Represented By: Ryan P Eckert
Represented By: Michael W Stebbins
Represented By: Marc G van Niekerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Technology Corporation d/b/a Sparton Milpitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Technology Corporation doing business as Sparton Milpitas
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?