Line Construction Benefit Fund v. Mario's Tree Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund and Line Construction Benefit Fund
Defendant: Mario's Tree Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04861
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Matthew Scott Jarka on behalf of Line Construction Benefit Fund (Jarka, Matthew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mario's Tree Service, Inc.(Passo, Alexander)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mario's Tree Service, Inc. by Alexander Isaac Ernst Passo (Passo, Alexander)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Line Construction Benefit Fund as to Line Construction Benefit Fund on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Jarka, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Mario's Tree Service, Inc. (jn, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17342980. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jarka, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Line Construction Benefit Fund v. Mario's Tree Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario's Tree Service, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Isaac Ernst Passo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jarka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Line Construction Benefit Fund
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jarka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?