American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. v. HP3 Law, LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc.
Defendant: HP3 Law, LLC and Howard Piggee III
Case Number: 1:2020cv04866
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED complaint by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. against HP3 Law, LLC, Howard Piggee III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hartman, Bradley)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #18 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 10/30/2020; Defendants shall reply by 11/13/2020. The initial status hearing set for 10/29/2020 #17 is stricken and re-set for 11/6/2020 at 9:15 a.m.The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 10/30/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants HP3 Law, LLC, Howard Piggee III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C)(Grieves, Constance)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #15 is granted. Motion for extension of time to answer #16 is granted. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading is extended to 10/15/2020. The initial joint status hearing set for 10/15/2020 #8 is stricken and re-set for 10/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 10/22/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants HP3 Law, LLC, Howard Piggee III for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to complaint (Grieves, Constance)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17373239. Christopher May (Grieves, Constance)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants HP3 Law, LLC, Howard Piggee III by Constance Grieves (Grieves, Constance)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. as to Howard Piggee III on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. as to HP3 Law, LLC on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17349500. (Hartman, Bradley)
August 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants HP3 Law, LLC, Howard Piggee III (exr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 10/8/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. by Kristine A Bergman (Bergman, Kristine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. by Belinda J. Scrimenti (Scrimenti, Belinda)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. by Phillip Barengolts (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barengolts, Phillip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. ; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17344365. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Barengolts, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc. v. HP3 Law, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP3 Law, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L May
Represented By: Constance Grieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Piggee III
Represented By: Christopher L May
Represented By: Constance Grieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association of Motorcycle Injury Lawyers, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda J. Scrimenti
Represented By: Kristine A Bergman
Represented By: Phillip Barengolts
Represented By: Bradley P. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?