Davis Bancorp, Incorporated v. Brink's Global Services USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Davis Bancorp, Incorporated
Defendant: Brink's Global Services USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04867
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Davis Bancorp, Incorporated (Novel, R. Timothy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. (Sawyer, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #16 is due 10/22/20. Defendant's reply is due 11/5/20. The court will issue a ruling via cm/ecf. Status report remains due 12/2/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Counter Defendant Davis Bancorp, Incorporated to dismiss counterclaim, amended (Novel, R. Timothy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Counter Defendant Davis Bancorp, Incorporated to dismiss counterclaim (Novel, R. Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by September 30, 2020, and all fact discovery shall be noticed in time for completion by March 31, 2020. Any requests to amend the pleadings or join parties must be made by January 12, 2021. The court will set a schedule for expert discovery and dispositive motions when the parties get closer to completing fact discovery. An agreed proposed confidentiality order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties may email susan_mcclintic@ilnd.uscourts.gov for a settlement referral. The parties shall file a joint status report with an update on discovery and settlement progress on 12/2/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. against Davis Bancorp, Incorporated . by Brink's Global Services USA, Inc.(Sawyer, Ryan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report Initial by Davis Bancorp, Incorporated (Haskin, Benjamin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. Defendant's response to the complaint is due 9/8/20. By 9/8/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Sawyer, Ryan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Davis Bancorp, Incorporated by Benjamin Eli Haskin (Haskin, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Davis Bancorp, Incorporated by R. Timothy Novel (Novel, R. Timothy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. by Simon A. Fleischmann (Fleischmann, Simon)
August 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Filing of Notice of Removal (Sawyer, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. by Ryan Aaron Sawyer (Sawyer, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sawyer, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois, case number (2020L007665) filed by Brink's Global Services USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17344387. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Sawyer, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis Bancorp, Incorporated v. Brink's Global Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink's Global Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Represented By: Simon A. Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Bancorp, Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin Eli Haskin
Represented By: R. Timothy Novel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?