Brown v. Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jean Brown
Defendant: Erika Williams, James D. Montgomery & Associates, Ltd., JP Morgan Chase Co, Lila Goldston and Michelle Montgomery
Case Number: 1:2020cv04893
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by the U.S. Marshals as to Lila Goldston waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (mc, )
September 30, 2020 SUMMONS Issued with a certified copy of the order dated 9/29/2020 and the USM-285 previous filed to the U.S. Marshals for Service as to Defendants Lila Goldston, JP Morgan Chase Co, James D. Montgomery & Associates, Ltd., Michelle Montgomery, Erika Williams (mc, ) .
September 30, 2020 MAILED Plaintiff a blank USM-285 service form for each Defendant, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of the order dated 9/29/2020 (mc, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT and 4 copies by Kimberly Jean Brown. (Exhibits).(mc, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the fees associated with filing this action and thus the filing fee is waived. The U.S. Marshal is appointed to serve Defendants. The Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's complaint #1 , issue summonses for service on Defendants by the U.S. Marshal; and send Plaintiff a blank USM-285 service form for each Defendant, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this Order. Alternatively, Plaintiff may elect to serve Defendants or request a waiver of service on his or her own. Telephonic status hearing set for 11/17/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Plaintiff and counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Kimberly Jean Brown for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Kimberly Jean Brown (lma, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Kimberly Jean Brown. (Exhibits) (lma, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Montgomery & Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?