360 Painting, LLC v. R Sterling Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: 360 Painting, LLC
Defendant: R Sterling Enterprises, Inc. and Robert Sterling
Case Number: 1:2020cv04919
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs have requested default be entered against defendants. If not response to this request is filed by 10/23/20 default pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 55(a) will be entered. Plaintiff shall mail this order to address where summons was served. Mailed notice (np, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST For Default (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cohen Declaration re Request for Entry of Default)(Cohen, Fredric)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 360 Painting, LLC as to R Sterling Enterprises, Inc. on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Cohen, Fredric)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 360 Painting, LLC as to Robert Sterling on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Cohen, Fredric)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 11/4/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants R Sterling Enterprises, Inc., Robert Sterling (kl, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 360 Painting, LLC (Cohen, Fredric)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 360 Painting, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17349966. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Rescission Offer Letter)(Cohen, Fredric)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 360 Painting, LLC v. R Sterling Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 360 Painting, LLC
Represented By: Fredric Adam Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Sterling Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?