Bradley v. Cook County Department Of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Defendant: Cook County Department Of Corrections, STG. White, C/O Almeda, C/O Ruzanski and Thomas Dart
Case Number: 1:2020cv05122
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Deandre Bradley for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (gcy, )
September 28, 2020 MAILED copy of Order dated 9/28/20 with I.F.P. Application (Non-Prisoner) to Deandre Bradley. (gcy, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (a) submit a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as detailed in this order, or (b) pay the statutory $400 filing fee. If Plaintiff does notcomply by November 1, 2020, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis for non-incarcerated persons to Plaintiff, along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff is advised that he must update his address promptly if itchanges. If he fails to comply, this case will be subject to dismissal with no further warning. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/28/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Deandre Bradley to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs. (gcy, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Deandre Bradley. (Attachments: #1 No Envelope postmark date)(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Cook County Department Of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Department Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STG. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Almeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Ruzanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?