Town Center Bank v. Bult Leasing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Town Center Bank
Defendant: Illini State Logistics, Inc., Robert L Bult, Illini State Trucking Co. Inc. and Bult Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05410
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Town Center Bank (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town Center Bank as to Bult Leasing, LLC on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/12/2020. (Maragos, Nicholas)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/2/2020 (aee, ).
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town Center Bank as to Robert L Bult on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town Center Bank as to Illini State Logistics, Inc. on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Illini State Trucking Co. Inc. regarding Summons , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town Center Bank as to Illini State Trucking Co. Inc. on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Telephonic initial status hearing set for 11/19/2020 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Town Center Bank by Kyle T Dillon (Dillon, Kyle)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Town Center Bank by Wendy Kaleta Gattone (Gattone, Wendy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Town Center Bank by Thomas J. Dillon (Dillon, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Town Center Bank by Nicholas Samuel Maragos (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 15, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Robert L Bult, Bult Leasing, LLC, Illini State Logistics, Inc., Illini State Trucking Co. Inc. (jg, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Town Center Bank (Maragos, Nicholas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Town Center Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17426526. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maragos, Nicholas)
September 11, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town Center Bank v. Bult Leasing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illini State Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Bult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illini State Trucking Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bult Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town Center Bank
Represented By: Nicholas Samuel Maragos
Represented By: Wendy Kaleta Gattone
Represented By: Thomas J. Dillon
Represented By: Kyle T Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?