Gecker v. Flynn et al
Plaintiff: Frances Gecker and Emerald Casino Inc doing business as HP Inc
Defendant: Robert W. Flynn and Brian J. Flynn
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng
Case Number: 1:2020cv05425
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Trustee's Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement With Brian J. Flynn, Robert W. Flynn, and Related Parties. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/14/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone status hearing held. Enter Order Granting Trustee's Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement With Brian J. Flynn, Robert W. Flynn, and Related Parties. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 14, 2020 FINAL closing order dated 10/14/2020 entered on USBC docket. (ph, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) with respect to the Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Approve Certain Settlements by Micah R. Krohn on behalf of Frances Gecker regarding certificate of service, #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Krohn, Micah)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service with respect to the Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Approve Certain Settlements by Micah R. Krohn on behalf of Frances Gecker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Krohn, Micah)
September 21, 2020 FINAL closing order dated 9/17/2020 entered on USBC docket. (ec, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Trustee's motion to withdraw the reference #1 is granted. Telephone status hearing set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 877-336-1839 and the access code is 6708061. Counsel of record will receive an email 10 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/15/2020. (rp, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Frances Gecker by Keri L Holleb Hotaling (Holleb Hotaling, Keri)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee Frances Gecker by Catherine L. Steege (Steege, Catherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 EMAILED Rule 83.16 letter to all counsel of record. (ph, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Ross, )
September 14, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gecker v. Flynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Gecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerald Casino Inc doing business as HP Inc
Represented By: Sven Thure Nylen
Represented By: James Howard Mandell Sprayregen
Represented By: Erik William Chalut
Represented By: Kathryn Frances Taylor
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?