Victory Sportswear, Inc. v. Transform Holdco LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victory Sportswear, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Transform Holdco, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05445
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-06011 (bg)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is DENIED as to the request to dismiss but GRANTED as to the request to transfer. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Case transferred electronically. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP) and Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds the DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #9 appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for September 14, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Victory Sportswear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF THAD M. SCROGGINS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6))(Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transform Holdco LLC, (Douglas, Stacy) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Transform Holdco LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DIANE SANTINELLO, #2 Exhibit 1- declaration, #3 Exhibit 2- declaration, #4 Exhibit 3- declaration, #5 Declaration 4- declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stacy Lynne Douglas added to party Transform Holdco LLC(pty:dft)) (Douglas, Stacy) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Victory Sportswear, Inc., upon Defendant Transform Holdco LLC served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Derrick Hackett, Associate Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Transform Holdco LLC (t/a Sears). (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff VICTORY SPORTSWEAR, INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff VICTORY SPORTSWEAR, INC., (Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff VICTORY SPORTSWEAR, INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27086341 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff VICTORY SPORTSWEAR, INC.. (Attorney Thad Marvin Scroggins added to party VICTORY SPORTSWEAR, INC.(pty:pla))(Scroggins, Thad) [Transferred from California Central on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Sportswear, Inc. v. Transform Holdco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform Holdco, LLC
Represented By: Stacy Lynne Douglas
Represented By: Lisa D Collinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Sportswear, Inc.
Represented By: Thad Marvin Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?