Hyper Microsystems Incorporated v. Legacy Micro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hyper Microsystems Incorporated
Defendant: Legacy Micro, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05500
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Hyper Microsystems Incorporated regarding Summons and Complaint served on Simon Dvorkin, Corporate Officer/Vice President on October 13, 2020 (Martin, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hyper Microsystems Incorporated by Joelle Marnie Shabat (Shabat, Joelle)
September 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Legacy Micro, Inc. (jg, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hyper Microsystems Incorporated by John Conroy Martin (Martin, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Martin, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hyper Microsystems Incorporated; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17445707. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, John)
September 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyper Microsystems Incorporated v. Legacy Micro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Micro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyper Microsystems Incorporated
Represented By: John Conroy Martin
Represented By: Joelle Marnie Shabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?