Richter v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rick Richter
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05508
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: A stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs having been filed, this case is hereby closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(maf)
March 10, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caplin, Laura)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. No. 11) is granted. The Court orders the case stayed pending arbitration. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/8/2020: Mailed notice(maf)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference held re: MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel #11 . The motion is taken under advisement and the Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2020 9:00 a.m. re: MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel #11 . Telephonic link: Click here to join the conference: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=2154460155&mac=9582710 Or Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115.Mailed notice(maf)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Rick Richterin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel #11 (Martos, Martin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rick Richter by Martin R. Martos, II (Martos, Martin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rick Richter by Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye (Devroye, Jennifer)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsico, Jason)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Marsico, Jason)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Jason Gregory Marsico (Marsico, Jason)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Daniel Cochran Craig (Craig, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Charles Kenneth Schafer (Schafer, Charles)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard (Sheppard, Hille)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rick Richter. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rick Richter by Laura Elizabeth Caplin (Caplin, Laura)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rick Richter by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rick Richter; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17446378.(Widman, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard
Represented By: Daniel Cochran Craig
Represented By: Jason Gregory Marsico
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Richter
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Widman
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Caplin
Represented By: Martin R. Martos, II
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?