Emoji Company GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Emoji Company GmbH
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2020cv05741
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/4/2020. Plaintiff's Motion for entry of preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Mailed notice(vcf, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Emoji Company GmbH in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #28 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 27 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/1/2020. Mailed notice(vcf, ) Modified on 11/5/2020 (bg, ).
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #5 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #7 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry if a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #9 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (lma, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (lma, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Emoji Company GmbH (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 13 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 12 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 11 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 10 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Emoji Company GmbH in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Santiago Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Reiter Declaration, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, A Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 11/5/2020 (bg, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Emoji Company GmbH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17479103. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emoji Company GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emoji Company GmbH
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?