Moeljona v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Khan Moeljona and Khan Moeljono
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Goodrich Corporation, Department of Transportation, The, Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, United States of America, The, Xtra Aerospace LLC, Federal Aviation Administration, The, Rockwell Collins, Inc. and Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv05773
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Khan Moeljono. Boeing Company, The waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hedayat, Mazyar)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Khan Moeljono as to Boeing Company, The. (Hedayat, Mazyar) (DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/29/2020 (ph, ).
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES by Plaintiff Khan Moeljono (Hedayat, Mazyar) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/27/2020 (ph, ).
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 10/26/2020 regarding emergency motions for leave to file amended complaints in 18 C 7686. Emergency motion for leave to file first amended complaint #6 is granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Khan Moeljono for leave to file EMERGENCY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hedayat, Mazyar)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Lien for Attorney's Fees by Kabateck, LLP (Noyes, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Case related to 18-cv-7686. Honorable Steven C. Seeger no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/13/2020. (mc, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hedayat, Mazyar)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Khan Moeljona by Mazyar Malek Hedayat (Hedayat, Mazyar)
September 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Khan Moeljona; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17483799.(Hedayat, Mazyar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeljona v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khan Moeljona
Represented By: Mazyar Malek Hedayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khan Moeljono
Represented By: Mazyar Malek Hedayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation, The
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtra Aerospace LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration, The
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?