Ahmed et al v. AbbVie Inc.
Plaintiff: Ahmed Ahmed
Defendant: AbbVie Inc and Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05855
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIVED from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04352 (bg)
October 1, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-103 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of June 6, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-103 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of June 6, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on December 17, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By December 11, 2020, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendant's counsel is directed to ensure that Plaintiffs are aware of this confernce. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/18/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AbbVie Inc. (LaFata, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AbbVie Inc. from Supreme Court of New York County of Kings, case number 507484/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13373324) (Attachments: #1 jExhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LaFata, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed et al v. AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Ahmed
Represented By: Michael N. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc
Represented By: Paul Anthony LaFata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anthony LaFata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?